Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Toppmoller (until 1993-06-30) | 1951-08-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Valentin Herr (until 1993-09-06) | 1957-07-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Clauss (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-01-13 | ||||
Kari Laukkanen (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-12-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Fellhauer (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-09-16 | ||||
Roland Dickgiesser (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Torsten Wohlert (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-12-10 | ||||
Marc Pehr (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-08-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Norbert Hofmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-01-01 | ||||
Matthias Dehoust (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-12-14 | ||||
Norbert Nachtweih (until 1996-06-30) | 1957-06-04 | ||||
Manfred Schnalke (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-03-09 | ||||
Slaven Stanic (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-08-23 | ||||
Rene Hecker (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-12-07 | ||||
Tom Stohn (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-12-21 | ||||
Uwe Weidemann (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-06-14 | ||||
Thomas Lasser (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-10-25 | ||||
Matthias Blum (until 1993-06-30) | 1973-12-03 | ||||
Wolfram Schanda (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-07-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Danny Winkler (until 1995-12-17) | 1973-08-16 | ||||
Jorg Kirsten (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-10-18 | ||||
Dmitriy Petrenko (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-06-18 | ||||
Sven Zahnleiter (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-09-13 | ||||
Uwe Freiler (until 1993-06-30) | 1966-05-02 | ||||
Olaf Schmaler (until 1993-06-30) | 1969-11-10 | ||||
Richard Naawuh (until 1993-06-30) | 1971-02-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1992-09-13 16:00 |
3 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1992-10-10 15:30 |
4 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |