Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rainer Zobel (from 1994-01-03) (until 1994-12-22) | 1948-11-03 | ||||
Dieter Renner (from 1993-11-10) (until 1994-01-02) | 1949-12-18 | ||||
Willi Entenmann (until 1993-11-09) | 1943-09-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Kopke (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-03-12 | ||||
Kurt Kowarz (until 1994-06-30) | 1958-04-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rainer Zietsch (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-11-21 | ||||
Kay Friedmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-05-15 | ||||
Markus Brand (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-09-19 | ||||
Lubos Kubik (from 1993-10-15) (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-01-20 | ||||
Marco Kurz (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-05-16 | ||||
Frank Schmidt (until 1994-06-30) | 1974-01-03 | ||||
Jorg Dittwar (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-08-01 | ||||
Uwe Wolf (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-10 | ||||
3 | Thomas Brunner (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-08-10 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Oliver Straube (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-12-13 | ||||
Jurgen Kramny (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-10-18 | ||||
Andre Golke (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-08-15 | ||||
Sergio Bustos (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-12-20 | ||||
Sascha Licht (until 1994-06-30) | 1974-09-27 | ||||
Alain Sutter (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-01-22 | ||||
Hans Dorfner (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-07-03 | ||||
Manfred Schwabl (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Thomas Kristl (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Marc Oechler (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-02-11 | ||||
7 | Michael Wiesinger (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-12-27 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Hans-Jorg Criens (from 1993-10-26) (until 1995-06-30) | 1960-12-18 | ||||
Christian Wuck (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-06-09 | ||||
Sergio Zarate (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-01-14 | ||||
Dieter Eckstein (until 1993-09-05) | 1964-03-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-25 17:45 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |