Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wilfried Hannes (until 1994-09-09) | 1957-05-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Karsten Hartel (until 1996-06-30) | 1961-04-04 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Withold Bolda (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-04-26 | ||||
Thomas Krisp (until 1996-06-30) | 1961-09-25 | ||||
Ralf Albarus (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-12-25 | ||||
Andreas Gielchen (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-10-27 | ||||
Ralf Kohnen (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-12-17 | ||||
Jens Tschiedel (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-08-05 | ||||
Andreas Goss (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-08 | ||||
Frank Schlutter (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-01-16 | ||||
Manfred Vigna (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-01-20 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ingo Kupper (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-12-08 | ||||
Frank Schulz (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-02-18 | ||||
Carsten Marquardt (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-06-02 | ||||
Muhidin Coralic (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-05-30 | ||||
Josef Zschau (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-01-07 | ||||
Guido Naumann (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-04-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Tim Gerhards (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-13 | ||||
Angelo Nijskens (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-06-01 | ||||
Jan Schroers (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-10-24 | ||||
Edin Hadzic (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-08-16 | ||||
Dariusz Dziekanowski (from 1994-01-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-09-30 | ||||
Michael Riethmacher (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-04-23 | ||||
Marian Bogatzki (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-08-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1993-08-24 20:00 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |