Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hermann Gerland (until 1995-06-30) | 1954-06-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gerd Muller (until 2014-06-30) | 1945-11-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernhard Hirmer (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-12-06 | ||||
Uwe Gospodarek (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-08-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Roman Grill (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-03-01 | ||||
Hans Pflugler (until 1997-06-30) | 1960-03-27 | ||||
Samuel Kuffour (until 1995-10-31) | 1976-09-03 | ||||
Marco Grimm (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-06-16 | ||||
Markus Munch (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-09-07 | ||||
Max Eberl (until 1993-12-31) | 1973-09-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Gerstmeier (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-10-11 | ||||
Werner Protzel (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-10-05 | ||||
Tobias Hager (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-08-13 | ||||
Thomas Radlspeck (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-11-16 | ||||
Ivica Grlic (until 1995-06-30) | 1975-08-06 | ||||
Frank Kramer (until 1994-12-31) | 1972-05-03 | ||||
Dietmar Hamann (until 1994-09-30) | 1973-08-27 | ||||
Dieter Frey (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-10-31 | ||||
Manfred Burghartswieser (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-08-23 | ||||
Aleksandr Karataev (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-11-22 | ||||
Harald Cerny (until 1993-10-12) | 1973-09-13 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Alexander Zickler (until 1995-12-31) | 1974-02-28 | ||||
Oliver Stegmayer (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-01-09 | ||||
Thorsten Ott (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-06-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1993-08-03 20:00 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1993-08-24 19:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1993-09-11 15:30 |
5 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1993-10-27 20:00 |
4 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |