Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ottmar Hitzfeld (until 1997-06-30) | 1949-01-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Henke (until 1998-06-30) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dr. Philipp Laux (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-01-25 | ||||
1 | Stefan Klos (until 1998-12-31) | 1971-08-16 | |||
12 | Wolfgang de Beer (until 2001-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Ned Zelic (until 1995-07-25) | 1971-07-04 | ||||
Michael Schulz (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-09-03 | ||||
Uwe Grauer (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-01-01 | ||||
Steffen Karl (until 1993-12-31) | 1970-02-03 | ||||
3 | Bodo Schmidt (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-09-03 | |||
6 | Matthias Sammer (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-09-05 | |||
7 | Stefan Reuter (until 2004-06-30) | 1966-10-16 | |||
20 | Gunter Kutowski (until 1996-08-15) | 1965-08-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Leonardo Rodriguez (from 1994-01-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-08-27 | ||||
Gerhard Poschner (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-23 | ||||
Michael Rummenigge (until 1993-09-14) | 1964-02-03 | ||||
2 | Knut Reinhardt (until 1998-12-31) | 1968-04-27 | |||
4 | Steffen Freund (until 1999-01-08) | 1970-01-19 | |||
8 | Michael Zorc (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | |||
18 | Lars Ricken (until 2007-12-31) | 1976-07-10 | |||
24 | Thomas Franck (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-02-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Flemming Povlsen (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-12-03 | ||||
Frank Mill (until 1994-06-30) | 1958-07-23 | ||||
Lothar Sippel (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-05-09 | ||||
9 | Stephane Chapuisat (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-06-28 | |||
13 | Karl-Heinz Riedle (until 1997-07-24) | 1965-09-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1993-08-03 18:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1993-08-24 20:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |