Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Hafner (until 1996-05-15) | 1952-02-02 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Christoph Franke (until 1996-05-14) | 1944-12-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jens Schmidt (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-04-03 | ||||
Holger Hiemann (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-01-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Torsten Bittermann (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-02-03 | ||||
Steffen Dunger (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-10-04 | ||||
Rene Krasselt (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-11-24 | ||||
Jorg Illing (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-10-02 | ||||
Peter Neustadter (from 1993-09-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-02-16 | ||||
Juri Wernydub (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-01-22 | ||||
3 | Thomas Laudeley (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-11-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Lutz Wienhold (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-09-15 | ||||
Mario Neuhauser (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-11-08 | ||||
Jens Wahl (until 1996-12-31) | 1966-07-24 | ||||
Silvio Meissner (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-01-19 | ||||
Heiko Gerber (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-07-11 | ||||
Olaf Renn (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-10-12 | ||||
Sixten Veit (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-01-07 | ||||
Ulf Mehlhorn (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-06-21 | ||||
Kujtim Shala (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-07-13 | ||||
Gregor Berger (until 1994-06-30) | 1975-11-21 | ||||
Peter Keller (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-06-22 | ||||
5 | Sven Kohler (until 1995-12-30) | 1966-02-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Steven Zweigler (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-11-26 | ||||
Frank Seifert (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-10-02 | ||||
Jan Geyer (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-10-01 | ||||
Ojokojo Torunarigha (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-03-12 | ||||
Radek Drulak (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-01-12 | ||||
Danilo Kunze (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-06-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1993-08-24 17:45 |
1 : 8 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1993-09-12 15:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |