Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wolf-Rudiger Krause (until 1994-06-30) | 1944-09-07 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Mathias Hain (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-12-31 | ||||
Oliver Lerch (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-08 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Pfannkuch (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-02-21 | ||||
Maik Kappel (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-08-08 | ||||
Ozkan Kocturk (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-11-06 | ||||
Willi Kronhardt (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-02-17 | ||||
Alexander Malchow (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-11 | ||||
Sergej Fokin (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-07-26 | ||||
Ulf-Volker Probst (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-10-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Roland Weisheit (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-02-12 | ||||
Arne Hoffart (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-12-06 | ||||
Milos Nedic (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-10-17 | ||||
Silviu Vuia (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-05-31 | ||||
Ralf Heskamp (until 1993-08-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Wiktor Pasulko (until 1996-06-30) | 1961-01-01 | ||||
Daniel Simon (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-08-19 | ||||
Igor Belanow (until 1995-06-30) | 1960-09-25 | ||||
Sven Berkenhagen (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-12-13 | ||||
Stefan Meissner (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-03-08 | ||||
Goran Radojevic (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-11-09 | ||||
Roman Sedlacek (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-01-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-25 17:45 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1993-09-10 20:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |