Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jorg Berger (from 1993-10-11) (until 1996-10-03) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Helmut Schulte (until 1993-10-10) | 1957-09-14 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hubert Neu (until 1996-10-03) | 1953-03-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jens Lehmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-11-10 | ||||
Holger Gehrke (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-08-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hendrik Herzog (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-04-02 | ||||
Gunter Guttler (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-05-31 | ||||
Markus Schwiderowski (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-12-12 | ||||
2 | Thomas Linke (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-12-26 | |||
4 | Yves Eigenrauch (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-04-24 | |||
15 | Michael Prus (until 1996-08-31) | 1968-02-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mark Schierenberg (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-08-01 | ||||
Jurgen Luginger (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-12-08 | ||||
Chad Deering (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-09-02 | ||||
Ingo Anderbrugge (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Fabijan Komljenovic (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-01-16 | ||||
Antoine Hey (until 1993-09-30) | 1970-09-19 | ||||
6 | Andreas Muller (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-12-13 | |||
12 | Uwe Scherr (until 1996-08-31) | 1966-11-16 | |||
19 | Mike Buskens (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-03-19 | |||
20 | Jiri Nemec (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-05-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Peter Sendscheid (until 1995-06-30) | 1965-09-28 | ||||
Miguel Pereira (until 1995-06-30) | 1975-08-23 | ||||
Dieter Eckstein (from 1993-09-06) (until 1995-03-05) | 1964-03-12 | ||||
Rainer Borgmeier (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-04-05 | ||||
Marinus Bester (until 1993-12-31) | 1969-01-16 | ||||
Alexander Borodjuk (until 1993-12-31) | 1962-11-30 | ||||
9 | Youri Mulder (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-03-23 | |||
18 | Serhij Dichtjar (until 1996-06-30) | 1975-08-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 1993-08-23 20:15 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1993-09-12 20:15 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |