Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Seppo Eichkorn (until 1994-06-30) | 1956-09-16 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Reinke (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-01-10 | ||||
1 | Klaus Thomforde (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-12-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Andre Trulsen (until 2002-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | |||
4 | Dieter Schlindwein (until 1997-06-30) | 1961-02-07 | |||
6 | Torsten Frohling (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-08-24 | |||
21 | Holger Stanislawski (until 2004-06-30) | 1969-09-26 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Bernd Hollerbach (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-12-08 | ||||
Martino Gatti (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-10-23 | ||||
Joachim Philipkowski (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-02-26 | ||||
Dirk Zander (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-05-13 | ||||
Sven Tholen (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-11-19 | ||||
Thomas Goch (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-10-04 | ||||
3 | Jurgen Gronau (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | |||
5 | Dirk Dammann (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-14 | |||
10 | Carsten Propper (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-10-20 | |||
18 | Oliver Schweissing (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-03-03 | |||
22 | Andreas Mayer (until 1995-07-31) | 1972-09-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Marcus Marin (from 1994-01-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-12-13 | ||||
Ari Hjelm (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-02-24 | ||||
Markus Sailer (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-04-26 | ||||
13 | Jens Scharping (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-07-16 | |||
16 | Leonardo Manzi (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-04-28 | |||
20 | Martin Driller (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-01-02 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-25 17:45 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1993-09-10 19:30 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |