Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Friedhelm Rach (until 1999-06-30) | 1952-02-09 | ||||
Paul Linz (until 1994-06-30) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jurgen Roth-Lebenstedt (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-10-22 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Kieren (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-07-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Uwe Heinsdorf (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-08-16 | ||||
Rolf Dockter (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-22 | ||||
Michael Schmitt (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-06-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Achim Eberhard (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-11-09 | ||||
Rudolf Muchka (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-09-14 | ||||
Rudi Thommes (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-12-17 | ||||
Axel Britz (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-01-16 | ||||
Reimund Brittner (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-01-10 | ||||
Tino Stohr (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-11-17 | ||||
Andreas Schu (until 1994-06-30) | |||||
Herbert Herres (until 1994-06-30) | 1959-03-12 | ||||
Marco Wagner (until 1994-06-30) | |||||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Wagner (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-05-19 | ||||
Mario Paul (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-03-21 | ||||
Michael Wagner (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-05-19 | ||||
Paul Linz (until 1994-06-30) | 1956-01-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-04 18:30 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |