Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Schafstall (from 1993-11-10) (until 1994-10-30) | 1937-02-22 | ||||
Eberhard Vogel (until 1993-11-09) | 1943-04-08 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hannes Baldauf (until 1994-06-30) | 1938-03-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Sievers (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Mathias Kuhlmey (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-02-28 | ||||
Jorg-Uwe Klutz (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-07-27 | ||||
Matthias Weise (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-06-19 | ||||
Axel Sundermann (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-01-23 | ||||
Dejan Raickovic (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-10-27 | ||||
Michael Schjonberg (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-01-19 | ||||
Uche Okafor (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-08 | ||||
Ayhan Piril (until 1994-06-30) | 1974-08-07 | ||||
Christian Schulz (until 1994-06-30) | 1974-08-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christof Babatz (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-09-03 | ||||
Reinhold Daschner (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-10-16 | ||||
Andreas Winkler (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-12-01 | ||||
Gunter Hermann (from 1994-01-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1960-12-05 | ||||
Marco Dehne (from 1994-01-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-06-09 | ||||
Frank Ellermann (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-07-10 | ||||
Martin Groth (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-10-20 | ||||
Michael Harforth (until 1995-06-30) | 1959-02-09 | ||||
Christiaan Pfortner (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-03-03 | ||||
Andreas Heraf (from 1994-01-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-09-10 | ||||
Theo Gries (from 1994-01-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-02-10 | ||||
Michael Schutz (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-12-12 | ||||
Lars Reuther (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-12-17 | ||||
Thomas Propper (from 1993-10-01) (until 1993-12-31) | 1970-08-04 | ||||
Hakan Bicici (until 1993-12-31) | 1970-08-01 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Carsten Mutze (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-09-19 | ||||
Waldemar Steubing (until 1994-12-17) | 1959-11-30 | ||||
Andre Breitenreiter (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-10-02 | ||||
Niclas Weiland (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-07-22 | ||||
Rocco Milde (from 1993-12-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-06-08 | ||||
Milos Delmas (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-06-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-04 20:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1993-08-25 17:45 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1993-09-11 15:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |