Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Heinsch (until 1994-06-30) | 1940-07-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Habermann (until 1994-06-30) | 1975-10-24 | ||||
1 | Daniel Hoffmann (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-10-27 | |||
13 | Jens Kunath (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-02-15 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Gernot Alms (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-10-07 | ||||
Pavel Dotchev (from 1994-02-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-09-28 | ||||
Holger Buhner (from 1994-01-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-08-08 | ||||
Carsten Sanger (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-11-08 | ||||
Stefan von Zschock (until 1994-06-30) | 1975-07-21 | ||||
5 | Uwe Ehlers (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-03-08 | |||
17 | Heiko Marz (until 1998-12-31) | 1965-07-09 | |||
21 | Mike Werner (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-02-13 | |||
25 | Marco Zallmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-11-17 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Aldo Majunke (until 1995-06-30) | 1975-10-03 | ||||
Bjorn Laars (until 1994-06-30) | 1974-12-05 | ||||
Jens Dowe (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-06-01 | ||||
Juri Schlunz (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-07-27 | ||||
Ingo Schlosser (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-12-08 | ||||
2 | Timo Lange (until 2003-06-30) | 1968-01-19 | |||
8 | Hilmar Weilandt (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-09-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Marco Kuntzel (until 1995-06-30) | 1976-01-22 | ||||
Stefan Persigehl (until 1995-06-30) | 1962-01-31 | ||||
Rene Gottwald (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-01-30 | ||||
Olaf Bodden (until 1994-10-04) | 1968-05-04 | ||||
Irsen Latifovic (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-12-28 | ||||
11 | Slawomir Chalaskiewicz (until 1997-12-31) | 1963-11-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1993-08-24 17:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1993-09-10 19:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1993-10-26 19:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |