Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Karsten Heine (from 1994-03-24) (until 1995-12-18) | 1955-04-06 | ||||
Uwe Reinders (from 1993-10-21) (until 1994-03-23) | 1955-01-19 | ||||
Gunter Sebert (until 1993-10-20) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Marco Sejna (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-03-20 | ||||
Walter Junghans (until 1993-12-31) | 1958-10-26 | ||||
1 | Christian Fiedler (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-03-27 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Sven Meyer (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-09-04 | ||||
Miroslav Tanjga (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-07-22 | ||||
Andreas Zimmermann (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-12-28 | ||||
Frank Rohde (until 1995-06-30) | 1960-03-02 | ||||
Gerald Klews (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-04-04 | ||||
Daniel Scheinhardt (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-10-25 | ||||
Uli Bayerschmidt (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-03-03 | ||||
23 | Oliver Schmidt (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dirk Bremser (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-10-01 | ||||
Thomas Richter (until 1996-10-15) | 1967-06-29 | ||||
Niko Kovac (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-10-15 | ||||
Sven Kaiser (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-08-27 | ||||
Carsten Ramelow (until 1996-02-19) | 1974-03-20 | ||||
Oliver Holzbecher (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-09-25 | ||||
Marco Zernicke (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-12-05 | ||||
Claus-Dieter Wollitz (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-07-19 | ||||
Ayhan Gezen (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-06-25 | ||||
Theo Gries (until 1993-12-31) | 1961-02-10 | ||||
19 | Andreas Schmidt (until 2008-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | |||
24 | Christian Fahrmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-10-05 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Mike Lunsmann (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-11-23 | ||||
Frank Schmoller (until 1994-12-31) | 1966-08-21 | ||||
Ernst Ogris (from 1993-09-09) (until 1994-12-31) | 1967-12-09 | ||||
Sven Demandt (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-02-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-04 18:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1993-08-24 20:00 |
3 : 5 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |