Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Frank Hartmann (from 1994-03-03) (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-09-27 | ||||
Hannes Bongartz (until 1994-03-03) | 1951-10-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Eilenberger (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-11-16 | ||||
Udo Mai (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-07-29 | ||||
Andre Alter (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-08-20 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Ridder (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-12-13 | ||||
Hans-Werner Moser (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-09-24 | ||||
Uwe Neuhaus (until 1995-06-30) | 1959-11-26 | ||||
Stefan Emmerling (until 1994-12-31) | 1966-02-10 | ||||
Jorg Bach (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-11-20 | ||||
Roger Prinzen (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-03-04 | ||||
Andrij Sydelnykow (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-09-27 | ||||
Thomas Audehm (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-05-02 | ||||
Thorsten Daniel (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-04-12 | ||||
Jorg Silberbach (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-03-08 | ||||
22 | Olaf Skok (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-07-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Eduard Buckmaier (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-06-09 | ||||
Carsten Wolters (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-07-25 | ||||
Karel Kula (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-08-10 | ||||
Ivica Jozic (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-07-22 | ||||
Thorsten Fink (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-10-29 | ||||
Karsten Hutwelker (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-08-27 | ||||
Stefan Studer (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-01-30 | ||||
Gunter Hermann (until 1993-12-31) | 1960-12-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Marek Lesniak (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-02-29 | ||||
Guido Silberbach (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-05-24 | ||||
Alexander Lobe (until 1994-11-30) | 1972-11-13 | ||||
Souleyman Sane (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-02-26 | ||||
Ali Ibrahim (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-01 | ||||
Uwe Tschiskale (until 1993-09-30) | 1962-07-09 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-25 17:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1993-09-12 15:00 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1993-10-27 19:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |