Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerd Roggensack (until 1994-06-30) | 1941-10-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Harry Deutinger (until 2004-04-01) | 1947-02-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Anton Hafele (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-06-15 | ||||
Rudolf Vidal (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-03-09 | ||||
27 | Peter Sirch (until 2002-06-30) | 1961-12-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dennis Grassow (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-10-10 | ||||
Dieter Schonberger (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-11-15 | ||||
4 | Ralf Bucher (until 2009-06-30) | 1972-04-06 | |||
6 | Jorg Bergen (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-06-27 | |||
24 | Ivica Vladimir (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-01-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andjelko Urosevic (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-04-01 | ||||
Fahrettin Durak (from 1993-08-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-07-18 | ||||
Thomas Renner (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-03-17 | ||||
Franko Bogdan (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-08-22 | ||||
Bernd Santl (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-01-08 | ||||
Martin Hangl (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-05-21 | ||||
Thomas Zwingel (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-09-17 | ||||
Michael Pfahler (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-11-29 | ||||
7 | Dirk Hofmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-06-06 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Helmut Lemberger (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-27 | ||||
Wolodymyr Ljutyj (from 1994-01-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-04-20 | ||||
14 | Alfonso Garcia (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-10-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-25 17:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1993-09-10 19:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |