Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gunter Sebert (from 1994-03-02) (until 1994-06-30) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (until 1994-03-01) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Edi Stohr (until 1994-06-30) | 1956-09-17 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Marco Langner (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-05-08 | ||||
Stefan Brasas (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Stefan Kuhn (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-12-29 | ||||
Jorg Sobiech (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-01-15 | ||||
Karsten Neitzel (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-12-17 | ||||
Marco Mutapcic (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-06-16 | ||||
Thomas Tuchel (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-08-29 | ||||
Petr Vrabec (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-06-05 | ||||
Jochen Novodomsky (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-04-04 | ||||
Dirk Wullbier (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-07-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Osman Per (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-06-20 | ||||
Tayfun Korkut (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-04-02 | ||||
Dirk Flock (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-05-23 | ||||
Michael Koch (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-27 | ||||
Ralf Vollmer (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-07-05 | ||||
Stefan Minkwitz (from 1993-09-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-06-01 | ||||
Steffen Herzberger (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-09-21 | ||||
Janusz Gora (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-07-08 | ||||
Robert Hofacker (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-12-22 | ||||
Adnan Kevric (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-05-02 | ||||
Andre Sirocks (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-09-18 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Oliver Sturm (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-03-20 | ||||
Fredi Bobic (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-10-30 | ||||
Sean Dundee (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-12-07 | ||||
Demir Hotic (from 1993-10-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-07-09 | ||||
Dimitrios Moutas (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-04-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-25 20:00 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |