Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Valentin Herr (from 1993-09-07) (until 1994-06-30) | 1957-07-11 | ||||
Jurgen Sundermann (until 1993-09-06) | 1940-01-25 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Valentin Herr (until 1993-09-06) | 1957-07-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Clauss (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-01-13 | ||||
Kari Laukkanen (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-12-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Enrico Barth (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-10-06 | ||||
Frank Scheuber (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-10-21 | ||||
Michael Kopper (until 1996-10-31) | 1966-11-17 | ||||
Harald Preuss (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-10-23 | ||||
Andreas Fellhauer (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-09-16 | ||||
Roland Dickgiesser (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Marc Ritschel (until 1994-06-30) | 1975-09-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Norbert Hofmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-01-01 | ||||
Matthias Dehoust (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-12-14 | ||||
Michael Zeyer (from 1993-09-16) (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-06-09 | ||||
Norbert Nachtweih (until 1996-06-30) | 1957-06-04 | ||||
Manfred Schnalke (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-03-09 | ||||
Slaven Stanic (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-08-23 | ||||
Rene Hecker (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-12-07 | ||||
Henrik Larsen (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-05-17 | ||||
Tom Stohn (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-12-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Thomas Epp (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-04-07 | ||||
Danny Winkler (until 1995-12-17) | 1973-08-16 | ||||
Gustav Policella (until 1995-06-30) | 1975-09-14 | ||||
Jorg Kirsten (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-10-18 | ||||
Dmitriy Petrenko (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-06-18 | ||||
Sven Zahnleiter (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-09-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1993-08-24 19:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |