Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 1995-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Rost (until 1994-08-31) | 1973-06-30 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jens Lellek (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-01-31 | ||||
Jens Barschan (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-10-08 | ||||
Bernd Goldschmidt (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-04-24 | ||||
Torsten Rauh (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-11-23 | ||||
Frank Meissner (until 1994-06-30) | 1973-09-14 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Thomas Penshorn (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-08-27 | ||||
Mike Barten (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-11-20 | ||||
Christoph Krampe (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-14 | ||||
Martin Przondziono (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-06-11 | ||||
Lars Unger (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-09-30 | ||||
Christian Thon (until 1994-06-30) | 1975-01-09 | ||||
16 | Danny Futterer (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-08-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Sven Simonsen (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-11-28 | ||||
Norman Schindler (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-11-10 | ||||
Lars Toborg (until 1994-06-30) | 1975-08-19 | ||||
Ralf Faulhaber (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-07-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 1993-08-02 20:15 |
1 : 5 |
Schema Compare |