Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Damian Halata (from 1994-04-10) (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-08-08 | ||||
Jurgen Sundermann (from 1994-02-22) (until 1994-04-09) | 1940-01-25 | ||||
Bernd Stange (until 1994-02-21) | 1948-03-14 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Damian Halata (until 1994-04-09) | 1962-08-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Rene Koslowski (until 2000-06-30) | 1971-07-09 | ||||
Maik Kischko (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-07-07 | ||||
Ingo Saager (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-11-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Matthias Lindner (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-10-05 | ||||
Frank Edmond (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-12-23 | ||||
Torsten Kracht (from 1994-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-10-04 | ||||
Helmut Gabriel (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-10-03 | ||||
Rico Kauerhof (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-12-09 | ||||
Holger Buhner (until 1993-12-31) | 1966-08-08 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Trommer (until 2004-06-30) | 1964-03-29 | ||||
Rene Schmidt (until 1996-12-31) | 1974-10-30 | ||||
Matthias Liebers (until 1996-06-30) | 1958-11-22 | ||||
Alexander Opoku (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-08-31 | ||||
Dieter Hecking (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Dirk Anders (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-09-26 | ||||
John Doyle (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-03-16 | ||||
Uwe Bredow (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-08-22 | ||||
Jorg Engelmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-09-04 | ||||
3 | Nico Dabritz (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-08-26 | |||
6 | Steffen Heidrich (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-07-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Franklin Bittencourt (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-02-24 | ||||
Jurgen Rische (until 1995-12-03) | 1970-10-30 | ||||
Marco Grafe (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-09-23 | ||||
Florian Weichert (from 1993-09-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-01-28 | ||||
Darko Pancev (from 1994-02-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-09-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Tuesday, 1993-08-24 20:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |