Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Fuchs (until 1994-04-16) | 1948-10-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Hans Jorg Butt (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-05-28 | ||||
Andreas Nofz (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-11-17 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wieslaw Cisek (from 1994-01-01) (until 2001-06-30) | 1963-01-02 | ||||
Krzysztof Zajac (until 1996-06-30) | 1958-02-25 | ||||
Sandy Enge (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-06-30 | ||||
Dirk Lellek (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-01-03 | ||||
Thomas Grabow (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-09-07 | ||||
Dirk Paulig (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-12-17 | ||||
Jens Landrath (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-22 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Alexander Woloschin (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-04-04 | ||||
Timo Ehle (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-11-02 | ||||
Sven Bremer (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-06-02 | ||||
Patrick Zierott (until 1996-12-31) | 1966-06-25 | ||||
Carsten Herrmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-12-06 | ||||
Wolfgang Steinbach (until 1994-06-30) | 1954-09-21 | ||||
Mathias Tratmar (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-07-18 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Horst Elberfeld (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-09-18 | ||||
Eugeniusz Ptak (from 1994-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1960-09-01 | ||||
Arie van Lent (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-08-31 | ||||
Boris Ekmescic (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-11-10 | ||||
Branko Zibert (until 1993-12-31) | 1968-07-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-25 17:45 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |