Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Jochen Rucker (until 2005-06-30) | 1944-12-30 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Rober (from 1993-12-15) (until 1995-04-25) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Christoph Daum (until 1993-12-10) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Eike Immel (until 1995-06-30) | 1960-11-27 | ||||
22 | Eberhard Trautner (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-02-07 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Jochen Endress (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-11-03 | ||||
Eyjolfur Sverrisson (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-08-03 | ||||
Alexander Strehmel (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-03-20 | ||||
Michael Frontzeck (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-03-26 | ||||
Uwe Schneider (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-08-28 | ||||
Torsten Kracht (until 1993-12-31) | 1967-10-04 | ||||
4 | Thomas Berthold (until 2001-01-16) | 1964-11-12 | |||
6 | Guido Buchwald (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-01-24 | |||
13 | Gunther Schafer (until 1996-09-30) | 1962-06-09 | |||
14 | Thomas Schneider (until 2003-06-30) | 1972-11-24 | |||
25 | Slobodan Dubajic (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-02-19 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marc Kienle (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-10-22 | ||||
Dunga (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-10-31 | ||||
Thomas Strunz (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-04-25 | ||||
Oliver Otto (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-11-21 | ||||
7 | Andreas Buck (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-12-29 | |||
19 | Michael Bochtler (until 1996-06-30) | 1975-10-15 | |||
31 | Ludwig Kogl (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-03-07 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Thomas Brdaric (until 1994-06-30) | 1975-01-23 | ||||
Adrian Knup (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-07-02 | ||||
Fritz Walter (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-07-21 | ||||
Axel Kruse (until 1994-03-31) | 1967-09-27 | ||||
21 | Sascha Maier (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-01-02 | |||
23 | Marcus Ziegler (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-08-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-25 17:45 |
2 : 6 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |