Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Gelsdorf (until 1994-11-06) | 1953-01-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Zumdick (until 1995-06-30) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Andreas Wessels (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-07-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rob Reekers (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Uwe Stover (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-02-08 | ||||
Sven Christians (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-01-28 | ||||
Olaf Dressel (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-09-19 | ||||
12 | Christian Herrmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-01-16 | |||
13 | Max Eberl (from 1994-01-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-09-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Markus von Ahlen (from 1994-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-01-01 | ||||
Uwe Wegmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-01-14 | ||||
Michael Hubner (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-08-12 | ||||
Jorg Schwanke (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-01-12 | ||||
Dirk Eitzert (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-11-01 | ||||
Paolo da Palma (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-03-18 | ||||
Frank Heinemann (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-01-08 | ||||
Dirk Helmig (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-05-03 | ||||
6 | Peter Peschel (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-01-26 | |||
7 | Kai Michalke (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-04-05 | |||
10 | Dariusz Wosz (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-06-08 | |||
24 | Thordur Gudjonsson (from 1993-10-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-10-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Joo-Sung Kim (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-01-17 | ||||
Robert Mawick (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-01-09 | ||||
Rocco Milde (until 1993-11-30) | 1969-06-08 | ||||
23 | Holger Aden (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-08-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Monday, 1993-08-23 20:15 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |