Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Biskup (until 1995-02-28) | 1942-04-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Brunn (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-11-20 | ||||
Christof Rekers (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-25 | ||||
Miroslaw Dreszer (until 1993-12-31) | 1965-08-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Mirko Baschetti (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-12-02 | ||||
Dirk Gellrich (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Lars Schiersand (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-02-14 | ||||
Wolfgang Schutte (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-01-24 | ||||
Holger Karp (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-03-26 | ||||
Igor Bulanow (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-11-15 | ||||
Ralf Heskamp (from 1993-09-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Jorg Freybott (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-08-01 | ||||
Ronald Maul (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-02-13 | ||||
Karsten Surmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1959-10-05 | ||||
Michael Wirtz (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-09-10 | ||||
Christian Brand (until 1994-06-30) | 1972-05-23 | ||||
Amarildo Zela (until 1993-12-31) | 1972-08-25 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ralf Balzis (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-07-31 | ||||
Fred Klaus (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-02-27 | ||||
Frank Hartmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1960-08-17 | ||||
Lars Ravida (until 1995-06-30) | |||||
Vladan Milovanovic (until 1994-06-30) | 1970-07-07 | ||||
Ralf Bockmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-09-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-04 20:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |