Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Eckhard Krautzun (until 1995-04-04) | 1941-01-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Hossbach (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-11-13 | ||||
Burkhard Kick (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-08-25 | ||||
1 | Uwe Zimmermann (until 1999-06-30) | 1962-02-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Lieberam (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-12-17 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Emig (until 1995-06-30) | 1962-06-29 | ||||
Frank Ockert (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-11-08 | ||||
4 | Jann Jensen (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-02-22 | |||
8 | Holger Ballwanz (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-09-07 | |||
15 | Peter Kleeschatzky (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-06-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Butrej (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-06-26 | ||||
Ralf Ewen (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Brunner (until 1995-06-30) | 1965-02-02 | ||||
Stephan Tauber (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-10-08 | ||||
Jacek Frackiewicz (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-09-19 | ||||
Stefan Holze (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-05-14 | ||||
Bruno Akrapovic (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-09-26 | ||||
Thomas Gerstner (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-11-06 | ||||
Bernd Winter (until 1994-06-30) | 1971-07-24 | ||||
18 | Detlev Dammeier (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Siegfried Reich (until 1996-06-30) | 1959-09-29 | ||||
Frank Plagge (from 1993-12-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Holger Fiebich (until 1994-06-30) | 1968-05-21 | ||||
Fahed Dermech (until 1993-12-31) | 1966-11-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1993-08-25 17:45 |
4 : 2 PSO |
Schema Compare |