Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gunter Sebert (from 1995-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Rainer Zobel (until 1994-12-22) | 1948-11-03 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Sandhowe (until 1995-06-30) | 1953-12-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Harald Ebertz (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-05-18 | ||||
Perry Brautigam (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-03-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Kemal Halat (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-07-05 | ||||
Rainer Zietsch (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-11-21 | ||||
Kay Friedmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-05-15 | ||||
Markus Brand (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-09-19 | ||||
Lubos Kubik (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-01-20 | ||||
Thomas Eichin (from 1995-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-10-09 | ||||
Lutz Braun (from 1995-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-06-03 | ||||
3 | Thomas Brunner (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-08-10 | |||
6 | Frank Baumann (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-10-29 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Oliver Straube (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-12-13 | ||||
Martin Przondziono (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-06-11 | ||||
Alexander Contala (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-11-02 | ||||
Jorg Bohme (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-01-22 | ||||
Jurgen Kramny (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-10-18 | ||||
Andre Golke (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-08-15 | ||||
Sergio Bustos (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-12-20 | ||||
Frank Moller (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-07-11 | ||||
Tobias Maus (until 1995-06-30) | 1976-08-05 | ||||
Reinhold Hintermaier (from 1995-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1956-02-14 | ||||
7 | Michael Wiesinger (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-12-27 | |||
10 | Marc Oechler (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-02-11 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Hans-Jorg Criens (until 1995-06-30) | 1960-12-18 | ||||
Arnar Gunnlaugsson (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-03-06 | ||||
Bjarki Gunnlaugsson (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-03-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1994-08-12 19:30 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |