Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ottmar Hitzfeld (until 1997-06-30) | 1949-01-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Michael Henke (until 1998-06-30) | 1957-04-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Stefan Klos (until 1998-12-31) | 1971-08-16 | |||
12 | Wolfgang de Beer (until 2001-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Ned Zelic (until 1995-07-25) | 1971-07-04 | ||||
3 | Bodo Schmidt (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-09-03 | |||
5 | Julio Cesar (until 1998-06-30) | 1963-03-08 | |||
6 | Matthias Sammer (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-09-05 | |||
7 | Stefan Reuter (until 2004-06-30) | 1966-10-16 | |||
16 | Martin Kree (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-01-27 | |||
19 | Marco Kurz (until 1995-08-15) | 1969-05-16 | |||
20 | Gunter Kutowski (until 1996-08-15) | 1965-08-02 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marc Arnold (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-09-19 | ||||
Frank Riethmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1975-12-09 | ||||
2 | Knut Reinhardt (until 1998-12-31) | 1968-04-27 | |||
4 | Steffen Freund (until 1999-01-08) | 1970-01-19 | |||
8 | Michael Zorc (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | |||
10 | Andreas Moller (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-09-02 | |||
18 | Lars Ricken (until 2007-12-31) | 1976-07-10 | |||
23 | Rene Tretschok (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-12-23 | |||
24 | Thomas Franck (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-02-24 | |||
28 | Mallam Yahaya (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-12-31 | |||
30 | Lars Muller (until 1996-10-05) | 1976-03-22 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Flemming Povlsen (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-12-03 | ||||
9 | Stephane Chapuisat (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-06-28 | |||
13 | Karl-Heinz Riedle (until 1997-07-24) | 1965-09-16 | |||
22 | Ibrahim Tanko (until 2001-03-31) | 1977-07-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1994-08-13 15:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1994-09-20 20:20 |
6 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |