Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1995-10-24) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Wiesner (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-02-20 | ||||
Adam Matysek (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-09-01 | ||||
Walter Junghans (until 1996-06-30) | 1958-10-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hans-Jorg Schneider (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-01-22 | ||||
Nico Niedziella (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-05-31 | ||||
Jurgen Radschuweit (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-12-04 | ||||
18 | Matthias Mink (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-07-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Charles Akonnor (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-03-12 | ||||
Dirk de Wit (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-06-09 | ||||
Jurgen Niggemann (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-01-04 | ||||
Antoine Hey (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-09-19 | ||||
Dirk Lottner (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-03-04 | ||||
Andreas Brandts (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-04-09 | ||||
Martin Luhr (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-11-01 | ||||
3 | Marco Zernicke (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-12-05 | |||
6 | Jorg Lipinski (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-10-31 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Mikkel Beck (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-05-12 | ||||
Jacob Svinggaard (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-09-27 | ||||
Roy Prager (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-09-22 | ||||
Uwe Fuchs (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-07-23 | ||||
Frank Schmoller (from 1995-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-08-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1994-08-13 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1994-09-10 15:30 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1994-11-08 20:00 |
7 : 3 |
Schema Compare |