Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Friedhelm Rach (until 1999-06-30) | 1952-02-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jurgen Roth-Lebenstedt (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-10-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Ralf Gorgen (until 2002-06-30) | 1970-06-21 | ||||
Uwe Heinsdorf (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-08-16 | ||||
Marcus Koster (until 2000-06-30) | 1972-09-14 | ||||
Rolf Dockter (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-08-22 | ||||
Neale Marmon (until 1995-08-31) | 1961-04-21 | ||||
Michael Schmitt (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-06-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Achim Eberhard (until 2002-06-30) | 1974-11-09 | ||||
Markus Kuhnen (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-09-15 | ||||
Giorgi Guduschauri (from 1995-01-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-02-18 | ||||
Rudolf Muchka (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-09-14 | ||||
Werner Heinzen (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-05-20 | ||||
Rudi Thommes (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-12-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Wagner (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-05-19 | ||||
Mario Paul (until 2000-06-30) | 1974-03-21 | ||||
Michael Wagner (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-05-19 | ||||
Rainer Ernst (until 1997-06-30) | 1961-12-31 | ||||
Wolodymyr Ljutyj (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-04-20 | ||||
Tomasz Lizak (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-05-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1994-08-12 18:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1994-09-10 15:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |