Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Friedhelm Funkel (until 1996-05-13) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Simon Jentzsch (until 1995-06-30) | 1976-05-04 | ||||
1 | Bernd Dreher (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-11-02 | |||
16 | Alexander Bade (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-08-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Sergej Gorlukowitsch (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-11-18 | ||||
2 | Helmut Rahner (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-03-29 | |||
3 | Jan Heintze (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-08-17 | |||
4 | Stephan Passlack (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-08-24 | |||
5 | Heiko Peschke (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-09-18 | |||
13 | Mustafa Dogan (until 1996-06-30) | 1976-01-01 | |||
19 | Uwe Grauer (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-01-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hannes Reinmayr (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-08-23 | ||||
Michal Probierz (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-09-24 | ||||
Kai-Uwe Schnell (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-12-14 | ||||
8 | Axel Juptner (until 1997-10-31) | 1969-04-26 | |||
10 | Horst Steffen (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-03-03 | |||
12 | Sebastian Hahn (until 1996-06-30) | 1975-12-18 | |||
14 | Marcus Wedau (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-12-31 | |||
17 | Gerd Kuhn (until 1997-12-31) | 1968-03-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Markus Feldhoff (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-08-29 | ||||
Frank Weber (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-02-23 | ||||
7 | Gunter Bittengel (until 1996-12-31) | 1966-07-14 | |||
9 | Rainer Krieg (until 1995-12-31) | 1968-02-02 | |||
11 | Heiko Laessig (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-06-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1994-08-12 20:00 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1994-09-10 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |