Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Herbert Schaty (until 1997-03-15) | 1949-04-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Rene Glasenhardt (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-02-18 | ||||
Marcus Croonen (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-03-19 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Stefan Glaser (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Ralf Zurlein (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-07-06 | ||||
Daniel Ciuca (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-06-01 | ||||
Frank Dorr (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-09-21 | ||||
Yvo Hoffmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-07-02 | ||||
4 | Leo Caic (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-12-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Frank Stier (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-06-09 | ||||
Radenko Vukelic (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-06-03 | ||||
Jurgen Bellersheim (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-08-16 | ||||
Tomas Oral (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-04-24 | ||||
Olaf Kirn (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-12-30 | ||||
Slavisa Dacic (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-10-12 | ||||
Dragan Reljic (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-01-30 | ||||
Mike Schmidt (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-01-21 | ||||
Miodrag Vucenovic (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-11-12 | ||||
Ralf Holzke (until 1996-06-30) | 1975-04-29 | ||||
Oliver Lowel (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-08-13 | ||||
Constantin Neagu (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-08-31 | ||||
Osman Ramadani (until 1995-06-30) | 1962-03-13 | ||||
Norman Kurpiela (until 1995-06-30) | 1976-01-22 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Shaibu Abubakari (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-11-28 | ||||
Jens Krinke (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-01-14 | ||||
Ralf Haub (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-07-26 | ||||
Andreas Ruppel (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-06-28 | ||||
Ali Talib (until 1995-06-30) | 1975-09-18 | ||||
Thomas Lauf (until 1995-06-30) | 1965-05-13 | ||||
Romeo Wendler (from 1995-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-05-16 | ||||
Sascha Inerle (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-08-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1994-08-13 15:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |