Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rainer Ulrich (until 1995-06-30) | 1949-06-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Steffen Schmutz (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-10-26 | ||||
1 | Dr. Philipp Laux (until 2000-06-30) | 1973-01-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Tuchel (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-08-29 | ||||
Daniel Schmid (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-09-04 | ||||
Dieter Markle (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-06-15 | ||||
Frank Ockert (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-11-08 | ||||
Riza Ulusoy (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-03-20 | ||||
Oliver Wolki (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-12-30 | ||||
Petr Skarabela (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-11-24 | ||||
Dieter Steinhauser (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-03-09 | ||||
Steffen Grimminger (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-05-02 | ||||
Dragan Ninkovic (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-03-11 | ||||
8 | Tamas Bodog (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-09-27 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Klaus Perfetto (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-09-13 | ||||
Torsten Raspe (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-08-01 | ||||
Dieter Simon (until 1995-06-30) | 1962-07-25 | ||||
Andreas Walz (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-09-21 | ||||
Sascha Nikolajewicz (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-09-23 | ||||
Thomas Schlenk (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-08-07 | ||||
6 | Oliver Otto (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-11-21 | |||
7 | Markus Pleuler (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-05-10 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Radomir Chylek (until 1995-12-31) | 1967-03-26 | ||||
Markus Beierle (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-06-02 | ||||
Cem Albayrak (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-03-20 | ||||
11 | Dragan Trkulja (until 2002-06-30) | 1964-09-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1994-08-12 19:30 |
1 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1994-09-10 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |