Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Wolf (from 1994-10-27) (until 1998-02-18) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Paul Sauter (until 1994-10-26) | 1947-06-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Marco Langner (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-05-08 | ||||
25 | Bernd Klaus (until 2001-06-30) | 1967-02-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Xaver Zembrod (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-07-28 | ||||
2 | Dirk Wullbier (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-07-29 | |||
12 | Michail Smirnow (from 1995-01-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-08-10 | |||
15 | Achim Pfuderer (until 2000-06-30) | 1975-11-29 | |||
18 | Jochen Novodomsky (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-04-04 | |||
19 | Alexander Malchow (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-09-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Tobias Hagele (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-02-02 | ||||
Osman Per (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-06-20 | ||||
Tayfun Korkut (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-04-02 | ||||
Kurt Kremm (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-11-06 | ||||
Franko Bogdan (until 1995-06-30) | 1965-08-22 | ||||
7 | Robert Hofacker (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-12-22 | |||
10 | Adnan Kevric (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-05-02 | |||
11 | Janusz Gora (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-07-08 | |||
16 | Zoltan Sebescen (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-10-01 | |||
20 | Andre Sirocks (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-09-18 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Alexander Durr (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-02-04 | ||||
Oliver Sturm (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-03-20 | ||||
Jonathan Akpoborie (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-10-20 | ||||
Marc Volke (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-03-13 | ||||
8 | Markus Sailer (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-04-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1994-08-13 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1994-09-10 15:30 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1994-11-01 14:15 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |