Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Paul Hesselbach (until 1996-06-30) | 1951-07-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Scherbaum (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-03-19 | ||||
Gunther Reichold (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-06-10 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Schmidt (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-01-03 | ||||
Gerd Klaus (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-09-02 | ||||
Harry Koch (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-11-15 | ||||
Bernd Lunz (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-03-10 | ||||
Claus Jensen (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-10-28 | ||||
Bernd Eigner (until 1995-06-30) | 1972-05-01 | ||||
Bernd Studtrucker (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-02-02 | ||||
Tim Hufner (until 1995-06-30) | |||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christian Hassa (until 1996-06-30) | 1976-10-03 | ||||
Bernd Santl (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-01-08 | ||||
Jochen Weigl (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-04-21 | ||||
Roland Stein (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-01-19 | ||||
Frank Kramer (from 1995-01-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-05-03 | ||||
Andreas Scholl (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-11-12 | ||||
Werner Pfeuffer (until 1995-06-30) | 1960-12-19 | ||||
Thomas Latteier (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-03-04 | ||||
Uwe Ernst (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-01-31 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Harald Ebner (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-09-15 | ||||
Wolfgang Huttner (until 1995-06-30) | |||||
Reiner Wirsching (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-01-18 | ||||
Oliver Zettl (from 1995-01-01) (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-07-29 | ||||
Alexander Ferschke (until 1995-06-30) | 1974-02-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1994-08-14 20:15 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1994-09-10 15:30 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1994-11-01 14:15 |
3 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |