Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Toppmoller (from 1994-11-09) (until 1999-06-30) | 1951-08-12 | ||||
Jurgen Gelsdorf (until 1994-11-06) | 1953-01-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Zumdick (until 1995-06-30) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Andreas Wessels (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-07-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Frontzeck (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-03-26 | ||||
Rob Reekers (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Uwe Schneider (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-08-28 | ||||
Uwe Stover (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-02-08 | ||||
Sven Christians (until 1995-06-30) | 1967-01-28 | ||||
5 | Tomasz Waldoch (from 1994-10-16) (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-05-10 | |||
12 | Christian Herrmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-01-16 | |||
13 | Max Eberl (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-09-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Markus von Ahlen (until 1995-06-30) | 1971-01-01 | ||||
Uwe Wegmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-01-14 | ||||
Michael Hubner (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-08-12 | ||||
Jorg Schwanke (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-01-12 | ||||
Dirk Eitzert (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-11-01 | ||||
Robert Matiebel (until 1995-06-30) | 1973-11-25 | ||||
Paolo da Palma (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-03-18 | ||||
6 | Peter Peschel (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-01-26 | |||
7 | Kai Michalke (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-04-05 | |||
10 | Dariusz Wosz (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-06-08 | |||
17 | Frank Heinemann (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-01-08 | |||
24 | Thordur Gudjonsson (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-10-14 | |||
24 | Andreas Wieczorek (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-01-14 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Henryk Baluszynski (from 1994-10-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-07-15 | |||
11 | Eric Wynalda (until 1995-12-31) | 1969-06-09 | |||
18 | Roland Wohlfarth (from 1994-11-21) (until 1997-12-31) | 1963-01-11 | |||
23 | Holger Aden (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-08-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1994-08-14 15:30 |
0 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1994-09-10 15:30 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |