Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Otto Rehhagel (until 1995-06-30) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 2006-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Oliver Reck (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-02-27 | |||
16 | Hans-Jurgen Gundelach (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-11-29 | |||
20 | Frank Rost (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-06-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Andree Wiedener (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-03-14 | ||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Dietmar Beiersdorfer (until 1995-06-30) | 1963-11-16 | ||||
Rune Bratseth (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-03-19 | ||||
Bernd Goldschmidt (until 1995-06-30) | 1970-04-24 | ||||
Jens Lellek (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-01-31 | ||||
4 | Hany Ramzy (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-03-10 | |||
6 | Uli Borowka (until 1995-12-31) | 1962-05-19 | |||
14 | Michael Schulz (until 1997-06-30) | 1961-09-03 | |||
19 | Gunnar Sauer (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-06-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andreas Herzog (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-09-10 | ||||
5 | Dieter Eilts (until 2002-06-30) | 1964-12-13 | |||
7 | Mario Basler (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-12-18 | |||
8 | Mirko Votava (until 1996-12-08) | 1956-04-25 | |||
11 | Marco Bode (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-07-23 | |||
15 | Thomas Wolter (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-10-04 | |||
21 | Lars Unger (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-09-30 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Marinus Bester (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-01-16 | ||||
Wynton Rufer (until 1995-06-30) | 1962-12-29 | ||||
Sven Simonsen (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-11-28 | ||||
9 | Bernd Hobsch (until 1995-06-30) | 1968-05-07 | |||
18 | Frank Neubarth (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-07-29 | |||
22 | Wladimir Bestschastnych (until 1996-08-31) | 1974-04-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1994-08-13 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |