Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ernst Middendorp (until 1998-08-17) | 1958-10-28 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Frank Geideck (until 2007-02-11) | 1967-04-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Uli Stein (until 1997-06-30) | 1954-10-23 | |||
21 | Zdenko Miletic (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-04-23 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Frank Germann (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-08-26 | |||
3 | Michael Molata (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-02-10 | |||
4 | Ralf Voigt (until 1997-11-14) | 1965-12-31 | |||
5 | Thomas Stratos (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-10-09 | |||
7 | Peter Quallo (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-10-02 | |||
15 | Rene Dorfel (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-08-07 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Frank Geideck (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-04-02 | ||||
8 | Jorg Reeb (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-01-06 | |||
10 | Thomas von Heesen (until 1997-06-30) | 1961-10-01 | |||
12 | Ronald Maul (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-02-13 | |||
12 | Mike Schurmann (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-08-25 | |||
15 | Jorg Bode (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-08-22 | |||
20 | Armin Eck (until 1996-09-30) | 1964-12-08 | |||
23 | Peter Hobday (until 1996-12-31) | 1961-04-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Erik Groeleken (until 1995-12-31) | 1966-03-03 | ||||
9 | Fritz Walter (until 1997-06-30) | 1960-07-21 | |||
14 | Ayhan Tumani (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-10-02 | |||
17 | Stefan Studtrucker (until 1996-12-31) | 1966-11-25 | |||
18 | Iwajlo Andonow (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-08-14 | |||
21 | Roland Kopp (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-01-12 | |||
24 | Angelo Vier (from 1996-01-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-04-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1995-08-26 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1995-09-19 19:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |