Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rainer Ulrich (until 1998-06-30) | 1949-06-04 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gerd Muller (until 2014-06-30) | 1945-11-03 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Michael Probst (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-11-20 | ||||
Bernhard Hirmer (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-12-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Alexander Klitzpera (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-10-19 | ||||
Markus Weinzierl (until 1999-06-30) | 1974-12-28 | ||||
Roman Grill (until 1999-06-30) | 1966-03-01 | ||||
Hans Pflugler (until 1997-06-30) | 1960-03-27 | ||||
Frank Wiblishauser (until 1996-06-30) | 1977-10-18 | ||||
Klaus Augenthaler (until 1996-06-30) | 1957-09-26 | ||||
Rainer Aigner (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-09-04 | ||||
Stefan Beckenbauer (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-12-01 | ||||
Samuel Kuffour (until 1995-10-31) | 1976-09-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Wolfgang Gerstmeier (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-10-11 | ||||
Werner Protzel (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-10-05 | ||||
Matthias Born (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-03-09 | ||||
Matthias Predojevic (until 1996-06-30) | 1976-11-14 | ||||
Tobias Hager (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-08-13 | ||||
Frank Gerster (until 1996-06-30) | 1976-04-15 | ||||
Matthias Zimmermann (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-09-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Darko Peric (until 1996-12-31) | 1978-02-16 | ||||
Andri Sigthorsson (until 1996-07-12) | 1977-03-25 | ||||
Alexander Zickler (until 1995-12-31) | 1974-02-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1995-08-26 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |