Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Franke (from 1996-05-15) (until 2000-09-07) | 1944-12-20 | ||||
Reinhard Hafner (until 1996-05-15) | 1952-02-02 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Christoph Franke (until 1996-05-14) | 1944-12-20 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Weissflog (from 1996-01-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1956-10-12 | ||||
Jens Schmidt (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-04-03 | ||||
Alexander Kunze (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-01-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Torsten Bittermann (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-02-03 | ||||
Andrej Panadic (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-03-09 | ||||
Jens Melzig (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-09-28 | ||||
Steffen Dunger (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-10-04 | ||||
3 | Thomas Laudeley (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-11-18 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andre Krasselt (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-03-08 | ||||
Richard Culek (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-04-01 | ||||
Lutz Wienhold (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-09-15 | ||||
Michael Ballack (until 1997-06-30) | 1976-09-26 | ||||
Mario Neuhauser (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-11-08 | ||||
Jens Wahl (until 1996-12-31) | 1966-07-24 | ||||
Silvio Meissner (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-01-19 | ||||
Heiko Gerber (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-07-11 | ||||
Rene Hecker (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-12-07 | ||||
Olaf Renn (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-10-12 | ||||
Goran Milanko (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-10-30 | ||||
5 | Sven Kohler (until 1995-12-30) | 1966-02-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ilija Aracic (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-11-15 | ||||
Henri Fuchs (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-06-23 | ||||
Torsten Gutschow (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-07-28 | ||||
David Wagner (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-09-22 | ||||
Steven Zweigler (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-11-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Thursday, 1995-08-24 19:00 |
2 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1995-09-20 18:30 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1995-10-04 20:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |