Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dragoslav Stepanovic (from 1996-04-01) (until 1996-11-30) | 1948-08-30 | ||||
Charly Korbel (until 1996-03-30) | 1954-12-01 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ramon Berndroth (until 1997-06-30) | 1952-03-24 | ||||
Rudi Bommer (until 1996-06-30) | 1957-08-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Andreas Kopke (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-03-12 | |||
25 | Oka Nikolov (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-05-25 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Uwe Bindewald (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-08-13 | |||
4 | Dietmar Roth (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-09-16 | |||
5 | Manfred Binz (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | |||
14 | Mirko Dickhaut (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-01-11 | |||
15 | Kachaber Zchadadse (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-09-07 | |||
21 | Slobodan Komljenovic (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-01-02 | |||
29 | Burhanettin Kaymak (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-08-25 | |||
30 | Ned Zelic (from 1995-12-15) (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-07-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Maurizio Gaudino (until 1995-12-31) | 1966-12-12 | ||||
3 | Ralf Weber (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-05-31 | |||
7 | Ralf Falkenmayer (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-02-11 | |||
8 | Markus Schupp (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-01-07 | |||
10 | Jay Jay Okocha (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-08-14 | |||
12 | Rene Beuchel (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-07-31 | |||
17 | Oliver Bunzenthal (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-11-15 | |||
18 | Thorsten Flick (until 1998-10-18) | 1976-08-22 | |||
19 | Matthias Hagner (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-08-15 | |||
20 | Thomas Doll (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-04-09 | |||
22 | Michael Anicic (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-10-18 | |||
23 | Jorg Bohme (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-01-22 | |||
24 | Domenico Sbordone (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-09-03 | |||
28 | Rudi Bommer (until 1997-06-30) | 1957-08-19 | |||
31 | Matthias Dworschak (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-04-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
6 | Ivica Mornar (from 1995-09-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-01-12 | |||
9 | Rainer Rauffmann (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-02-26 | |||
11 | Johnny Ekstrom (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-03-05 | |||
16 | Matthias Becker (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-04-19 | |||
33 | Timo Reuter (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-07-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1995-08-26 19:30 |
1 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1995-09-19 20:00 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |