Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Torwarttrainer | |||||
Michael Stahl (until 1998-06-30) | 1959-12-09 | ||||
Trainer | |||||
Jorg Berger (until 1996-10-03) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hubert Neu (until 1996-10-03) | 1953-03-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jens Lehmann (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-11-10 | |||
22 | Mathias Schober (until 2000-06-30) | 1976-04-08 | |||
23 | Jorg Albracht (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-11-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
2 | Thomas Linke (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-12-26 | |||
4 | Yves Eigenrauch (until 2002-06-30) | 1971-04-24 | |||
5 | Tom Dooley (until 1997-06-30) | 1961-05-12 | |||
10 | Olaf Thon (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-05-01 | |||
15 | Michael Prus (until 1996-08-31) | 1968-02-04 | |||
17 | Frank Schon (until 1997-01-31) | 1971-01-15 | |||
21 | Marco Kurz (from 1995-08-16) (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-05-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
3 | Radoslav Latal (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-01-06 | |||
6 | Andreas Muller (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-12-13 | |||
7 | Uwe Weidemann (until 1996-12-31) | 1963-06-14 | |||
8 | Ingo Anderbrugge (until 1999-12-31) | 1964-01-02 | |||
12 | Uwe Scherr (until 1996-08-31) | 1966-11-16 | |||
13 | Waldemar Ksienzyk (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-11-08 | |||
16 | Oliver Held (until 2001-06-30) | 1972-09-10 | |||
19 | Mike Buskens (until 1999-12-31) | 1968-03-19 | |||
20 | Jiri Nemec (until 2002-06-30) | 1966-05-15 | |||
Sturm | |||||
9 | Youri Mulder (until 2002-06-30) | 1969-03-23 | |||
11 | Martin Max (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-08-07 | |||
14 | David Wagner (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-10-19 | |||
18 | Serhij Dichtjar (until 1996-06-30) | 1975-08-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1995-08-26 15:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1995-09-19 16:45 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1995-10-03 18:00 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |