Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rudi Gores (until 1997-03-10) | 1957-09-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
20 | Marc Petrick (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-04-19 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Helmut Gabriel (until 1996-10-31) | 1968-10-03 | ||||
Willi Landgraf (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-08-29 | ||||
Roman Geschlecht (until 1996-06-30) | 1961-12-28 | ||||
2 | Ingo Pickenacker (until 1999-06-30) | 1962-04-07 | |||
3 | Kristian Zedi (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-08-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christian Dondera (until 1996-12-31) | 1969-01-25 | ||||
Alois Schwartz (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-03-28 | ||||
8 | Christian Schreier (until 1996-09-30) | 1959-02-04 | |||
12 | Robert Ratkowski (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-08-03 | |||
13 | Jurgen Margref (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-01-06 | |||
15 | Dirk Helmig (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-05-03 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Markus Wuckel (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-04-05 | ||||
Stefan Thiele (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-10-06 | ||||
Jurgen Wegmann (until 1995-12-31) | 1964-03-31 | ||||
9 | Wolfram Klein (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-09-08 | |||
10 | Jorg Beyel (from 1995-10-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-10-02 | |||
17 | Oliver Grein (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-09-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1995-08-26 15:30 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1995-09-20 16:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1995-10-04 20:00 |
1 : 4 PSO |
Schema Compare |