Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Reinders (until 1997-06-09) | 1955-01-19 | ||||
Joachim Steffens (until 1996-06-30) | 1950-07-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Daniel Frohlich (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-08-13 | ||||
Ingo Saager (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-11-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Steffen Hammermuller (until 2000-06-30) | 1966-06-25 | ||||
Steffen Ziffert (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-08-25 | ||||
Jens Kahdemann (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-08-05 | ||||
Jens Thiemig (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-01-21 | ||||
Rico Pellmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-10-08 | ||||
Frank Nierlich (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-05-11 | ||||
Jorg Wunderlich (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-06-09 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Vidmantas Vysniauskas (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-09-15 | ||||
Torsten Feetz (until 1997-12-31) | 1967-12-01 | ||||
Kay-Uwe Jendrossek (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-10-25 | ||||
Dennis Arbeiter (until 1996-06-30) | |||||
Antoni Jelen (until 1995-12-31) | 1964-06-13 | ||||
5 | Frank Rietschel (until 2003-06-30) | 1971-03-04 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Oleh Holowan (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-09-21 | ||||
Marco Grafe (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-09-23 | ||||
Dirk Havel (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-10-11 | ||||
Hans-Jorg Leitzke (until 1996-06-30) | 1960-12-27 | ||||
Uwe Saalbach (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-09-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1995-08-26 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1995-09-20 16:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |