Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Peter Vollmann (from 1996-04-11) (until 1996-06-30) | 1957-12-22 | ||||
Jupp Koitka (from 1995-09-02) (until 1996-04-10) | 1952-02-12 | ||||
Franz-Josef Kneuper (until 1995-09-01) | 1952-10-31 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Kurth (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-03-15 | ||||
1 | Peter Martin (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-12-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Alexander Strehmel (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-03-20 | ||||
Thomas Ridder (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-12-13 | ||||
Sven Backhaus (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-06-01 | ||||
Jorg Sobiech (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-01-15 | ||||
Carsten Keuler (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-08-30 | ||||
Andreas Golombek (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-08-09 | ||||
4 | Andreas Teichmann (until 2004-06-30) | 1970-06-04 | |||
22 | Olaf Skok (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-07-31 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mark Schierenberg (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-08-01 | ||||
Michal Probierz (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-09-24 | ||||
Marko Jedlicka (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-05-24 | ||||
Miroslav Giruc (until 1996-12-31) | 1972-10-23 | ||||
Adrian Spyrka (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-08-01 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Brunner (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-02-02 | ||||
Andreas Sassen (from 1995-09-15) (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-01-14 | ||||
Eduard Buckmaier (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-06-09 | ||||
Dirk Klinge (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-06-30 | ||||
Abu Njie (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-10-13 | ||||
Matejas Jozipovic (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-05-23 | ||||
15 | Andre Gumprecht (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-12-26 | |||
16 | Rainer Schumann (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-10-01 | |||
17 | Marcus Hasecke (until 1998-06-30) | 1976-10-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ahmet Dursun (until 1997-06-30) | 1978-01-25 | ||||
Giuseppe Reina (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-04-15 | ||||
Michael Preetz (until 1996-06-30) | 1967-08-17 | ||||
Tomislav Maric (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-01-28 | ||||
Tino Milde (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-06-22 | ||||
Erik Groeleken (from 1996-01-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-03-03 | ||||
Jorg Beyel (until 1995-09-30) | 1969-10-02 | ||||
8 | Sergio Allievi (until 2000-06-30) | 1964-01-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1995-08-26 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1995-09-19 19:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |