Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lorenz-Gunther Kostner (until 1997-10-01) | 1952-01-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Harry Deutinger (until 2004-04-01) | 1947-02-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Jurgen Wittmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-08-14 | |||
22 | Udo Mai (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-07-29 | |||
27 | Peter Sirch (until 2002-06-30) | 1961-12-30 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Dennis Grassow (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-10-10 | ||||
Michael Fersch (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-07-23 | ||||
4 | Ralf Bucher (until 2009-06-30) | 1972-04-06 | |||
6 | Jorg Bergen (until 2001-06-30) | 1966-06-27 | |||
24 | Ivica Vladimir (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-01-25 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Matthias Lust (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-04-27 | ||||
Stephan Tauber (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-10-08 | ||||
Thomas Radlspeck (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-11-16 | ||||
Stefan Reich (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-02-02 | ||||
Albert Grober (until 1997-12-31) | 1967-04-26 | ||||
Christian Simon (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-06-30 | ||||
Markus Oberleitner (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-08-16 | ||||
Rajko Tavcar (until 1995-12-31) | 1974-07-21 | ||||
7 | Dirk Hofmann (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-06-06 | |||
8 | Peter Zeiler (until 2001-06-30) | 1970-10-08 | |||
16 | Andreas Hartig (until 2000-06-30) | 1970-10-17 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Schmoller (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-08-21 | ||||
Norbert Bartsch (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-05-04 | ||||
14 | Alfonso Garcia (until 2001-06-30) | 1969-10-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1995-08-25 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1995-09-19 16:45 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1995-10-04 19:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |