Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 1999-05-09) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jurgen Rollmann (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-10-17 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jens Lellek (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-01-31 | ||||
Kai Achilles (until 1998-06-30) | 1975-09-18 | ||||
Jens Barschan (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-10-08 | ||||
Bernd Goldschmidt (until 1997-06-30) | 1970-04-24 | ||||
Torsten Rauh (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-11-23 | ||||
Matthias Rulander (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-08-16 | ||||
Bjorn Schierenbeck (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-07-12 | ||||
Murat Salar (until 1996-06-30) | 1976-11-23 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christoph Dabrowski (until 1999-06-30) | 1978-07-01 | ||||
Thomas Penshorn (until 1999-06-30) | 1977-08-27 | ||||
Mike Barten (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-11-20 | ||||
Marco Hegerfeld (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-04-07 | ||||
Hendrik Volzke (until 1997-12-31) | 1975-03-22 | ||||
Christian Brand (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-05-23 | ||||
Aaran Lines (until 1996-06-30) | 1976-12-21 | ||||
Dennis Frey (until 1996-06-30) | 1975-12-09 | ||||
16 | Danny Futterer (until 2005-06-30) | 1975-08-28 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Ersan Dogu (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-04-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1995-08-25 18:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |