Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Michael Lorkowski (until 1996-10-19) | 1955-02-26 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Maik Wilde (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-08-14 | ||||
Sven Schmidtke (until 1996-06-30) | 1975-02-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Romas Mazeikis (until 2000-06-30) | 1964-04-28 | ||||
Holger Behnert (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-10-31 | ||||
Torben Hoffmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-10-27 | ||||
Thorsten Grummer (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-09-19 | ||||
Ibrahim Turkmen (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-05-17 | ||||
Frank Dalinger (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-11-18 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andre Golke (until 1998-06-30) | 1964-08-15 | ||||
Michael Koch (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-09-27 | ||||
Felix van der Steen (until 1998-06-30) | 1967-04-02 | ||||
Krzysztof Hetmanski (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-07-15 | ||||
Lars Kindgen (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-11-25 | ||||
Thomas Moller (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-07-12 | ||||
Timo Hempel (until 1996-06-30) | 1973-01-20 | ||||
Carsten Hinrichsen (until 1996-06-30) | 1968-06-04 | ||||
Jurgen Oelbeck (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-01-10 | ||||
Torsten Flocken (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-07-18 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Daniel Jurgeleit (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-12-15 | ||||
Markus Aerdken (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-12-05 | ||||
Lutz Schwerinski (until 1996-12-31) | 1966-02-18 | ||||
Sascha Hagen (until 1996-06-30) | 1977-03-10 | ||||
Aly Dia (from 1995-08-01) (until 1995-12-31) | 1965-08-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1995-08-26 15:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |