Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Toppmoller (until 1999-06-30) | 1951-08-12 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Ralf Zumdick (until 1999-12-31) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Uwe Gospodarek (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-08-06 | |||
21 | Thomas Ernst (until 2000-12-31) | 1967-12-23 | |||
31 | Stefan Wachter (until 2000-06-30) | 1978-04-20 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
3 | Torsten Kracht (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-10-04 | |||
5 | Tomasz Waldoch (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-05-10 | |||
12 | Christian Herrmann (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-01-16 | |||
13 | Max Eberl (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-09-21 | |||
19 | Mathias Jack (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-02-15 | |||
22 | Thomas Reis (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-10-04 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
2 | Thomas Stickroth (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-04-13 | |||
6 | Peter Peschel (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-01-26 | |||
7 | Kai Michalke (until 1999-06-30) | 1976-04-05 | |||
10 | Dariusz Wosz (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-06-08 | |||
16 | Filip Tapalovic (until 1996-06-30) | 1976-10-22 | |||
17 | Frank Heinemann (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-01-08 | |||
24 | Thordur Gudjonsson (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-10-14 | |||
24 | Andreas Wieczorek (until 1996-06-30) | 1974-01-14 | |||
30 | Andrzej Rudy (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-10-15 | |||
31 | Thorsten Schmugge (until 1996-06-30) | 1971-10-13 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Delron Buckley (until 1996-06-30) | 1977-12-07 | ||||
8 | Peter Kozle (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-11-18 | |||
9 | Henryk Baluszynski (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-07-15 | |||
11 | Eric Wynalda (until 1995-12-31) | 1969-06-09 | |||
13 | Yves Gaugler (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-06-10 | |||
18 | Roland Wohlfarth (until 1997-12-31) | 1963-01-11 | |||
23 | Holger Aden (until 1996-06-30) | 1965-08-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1995-08-26 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |