Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willi Reimann (from 1995-10-23) (until 1998-03-17) | 1949-12-24 | ||||
Gerd Roggensack (until 1995-10-22) | 1941-10-05 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Uwe Kliemann (until 1996-06-30) | 1949-06-30 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Hossbach (until 1996-06-30) | 1964-11-13 | ||||
1 | Uwe Zimmermann (until 1999-06-30) | 1962-02-11 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Matthias Maucksch (until 1997-06-30) | 1969-06-11 | ||||
Oliver Luttkenhaus (from 1995-12-01) (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-06-28 | ||||
Ulf-Volker Probst (until 1997-06-30) | 1964-10-03 | ||||
Frank Lieberam (until 1996-06-30) | 1962-12-17 | ||||
Mirco Thiel (until 1996-06-30) | 1977-07-17 | ||||
4 | Jann Jensen (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-02-22 | |||
6 | Jens Keller (from 1995-09-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-11-24 | |||
8 | Holger Ballwanz (until 2000-06-30) | 1967-09-07 | |||
15 | Peter Kleeschatzky (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-06-01 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Butrej (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-06-26 | ||||
Ralf Ewen (until 1996-06-30) | 1972-02-11 | ||||
Uwe Klein (until 1996-06-30) | 1970-01-11 | ||||
Ivica Jozic (until 1995-12-31) | 1969-07-22 | ||||
2 | Markus Kullig (until 1998-06-30) | 1974-11-04 | |||
3 | Matthias Stammann (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-05-08 | |||
17 | Sven Ratke (until 1998-06-30) | 1972-01-03 | |||
18 | Detlev Dammeier (until 2000-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | |||
20 | Sead Kapetanovic (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-01-21 | |||
21 | Michael Spies (until 1998-06-30) | 1965-07-09 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Siegfried Reich (until 1996-06-30) | 1959-09-29 | ||||
Guido Erhard (from 1995-09-01) (until 1996-06-30) | 1969-10-06 | ||||
7 | Roy Prager (until 1999-06-30) | 1971-09-22 | |||
9 | Piotr Tyszkiewicz (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-09-04 | |||
11 | Stefan Meissner (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-03-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1995-09-06 16:30 |
4 : 3 PSO |
Schema Compare |