Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willi Entenmann (until 1997-09-01) | 1943-09-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Goran Curko (until 1997-06-30) | 1968-08-21 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Uwe Schneider (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-08-28 | ||||
Kemal Halat (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-07-05 | ||||
Carsten Keuler (until 1997-12-31) | 1971-08-30 | ||||
6 | Frank Baumann (until 1999-06-30) | 1975-10-29 | |||
8 | Henning Burger (until 1999-06-30) | 1969-12-16 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Christian Mockel (until 1998-06-30) | 1973-04-06 | ||||
Timo Rost (until 1998-06-30) | 1978-08-29 | ||||
Cheriffe Toure (until 1998-06-30) | 1981-01-13 | ||||
Ivica Simunec (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-01-09 | ||||
Christian Hassa (until 1997-12-31) | 1976-10-03 | ||||
5 | Peter Knabel (until 1998-06-30) | 1966-10-02 | |||
7 | Michael Wiesinger (until 1999-06-30) | 1972-12-27 | |||
10 | Marc Oechler (until 1999-06-30) | 1968-02-11 | |||
24 | Armin Storzenhofecker (until 2000-06-30) | 1965-04-29 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Jurgen Falter (until 1998-06-30) | 1971-08-02 | ||||
Vits Rimkus (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-06-21 | ||||
Peter Jenkner (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-02-05 | ||||
Mirza Golubica (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-05-18 | ||||
Andras Tolcseres (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-11-28 | ||||
9 | Markus Kurth (until 1999-06-30) | 1973-07-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1996-08-09 19:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1996-08-31 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |