Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Reinhard Saftig (from 1997-03-11) (until 1997-08-25) | 1952-01-23 | ||||
Manfred Lorenz (from 1997-03-03) (until 1997-03-10) | 1948-08-26 | ||||
Wolfgang Frank (until 1997-03-02) | 1951-02-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Stephan Kuhnert (until 1999-06-30) | 1960-09-07 | ||||
1 | Dimo Wache (until 2010-06-30) | 1973-11-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Helmut Gabriel (from 1996-11-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1968-10-03 | ||||
Lars Meyer (until 1997-06-30) | 1974-05-14 | ||||
Hendrik Weiss (until 1997-06-30) | 1965-07-31 | ||||
3 | Uwe Stover (until 1999-06-30) | 1967-02-08 | |||
4 | Jurgen Klopp (until 2001-02-27) | 1967-06-16 | |||
5 | Peter Neustadter (until 2004-12-31) | 1966-02-16 | |||
21 | Miroslav Tanjga (until 1999-06-30) | 1964-07-22 | |||
24 | Marek Lemsalu (until 1997-06-30) | 1972-11-24 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Markus Kreuz (until 1997-11-30) | 1977-04-29 | ||||
Abderrahim Ouakili (until 1997-11-30) | 1970-12-12 | ||||
Bruno Akrapovic (until 1997-06-30) | 1967-09-26 | ||||
Aleksandr Karataev (until 1997-06-30) | 1973-11-22 | ||||
Michael Osei (until 1997-06-30) | 1971-09-15 | ||||
6 | Lars Schmidt (until 1999-06-30) | 1965-09-13 | |||
8 | Torsten Lieberknecht (until 2002-06-30) | 1973-08-01 | |||
11 | Christian Hock (until 2003-06-30) | 1970-04-11 | |||
12 | Steffen Herzberger (until 2000-06-30) | 1969-09-21 | |||
15 | Adrian Spyrka (until 2002-06-30) | 1967-08-01 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Luiz Antonio (from 1997-01-01) (until 1998-06-30) | 1970-11-30 | ||||
Gustav Policella (until 1997-06-30) | 1975-09-14 | ||||
7 | Sven Demandt (until 2001-06-30) | 1965-02-13 | |||
9 | Marco Grevelhorster (until 1999-06-30) | 1970-04-26 | |||
16 | Stipan Jakic (until 2001-06-30) | 1978-05-03 | |||
20 | Guido Erhard (until 1998-06-30) | 1969-10-06 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1996-08-09 19:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |